U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • April 22, 2021: [Reply to Response]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2021
  • February 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • February 12, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • February 01, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order]
  • January 28, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 23, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • April 23, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 15, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 15, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 21, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 19, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 19, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 18, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.