U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00186-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 26, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 12, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 10, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
December, 2018
  • December 30, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 09, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 20, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • September 20, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.