U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 11, 2019: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • October 11, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • August 13, 2019: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 25, 2019: [Exhibit (Restricted) (Document)]
  • July 25, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Docket Call]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 25, 2019: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 03, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 03, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 02, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 01, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 20, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • September 20, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.