U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Singleton et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Writ of Certiorari Denied - Supreme Court]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • October 05, 2022: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • February 08, 2022: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 08, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 03, 2021: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 03, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 19, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 18, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 07, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Remark]
  • September 13, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • September 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 20, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 07, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 16, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 13, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 17, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 06, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 19, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 19, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • October 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 05, 2018: [Bond]
  • October 05, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 01, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 01, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2018: [Arraignment]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 27, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.