U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00201-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saddler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 23, 2021: [Response]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 31, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • March 15, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • March 05, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 03, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order of Recusal]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 23, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 07, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 29, 2019: [Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 19, 2019: [Letter]
  • April 16, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 16, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 11, 2018: [Bond]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 11, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 11, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 04, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.