U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00215-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 25, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 12, 2021: [Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 05, 2021: [Remark]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Psychiatric Report]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 03, 2020: [Sealed Document]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 15, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 24, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 27, 2020: [Competency Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Psychiatric Report]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • July 12, 2019: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • July 10, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 10, 2019: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 08, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 05, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 03, 2019: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Response in Support]
  • April 23, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2019: [Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 22, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • February 21, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order]
  • December 14, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 08, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 29, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 24, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • October 24, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.