U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00210-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Underwood
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 30, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 22, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 22, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 27, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 21, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 21, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 01, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 01, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 24, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • October 24, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.