U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00219-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Letter]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Letter]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 13, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • November 06, 2018: [Restricted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.