U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00221-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gammill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Medical Treatment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Medical Treatment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Status Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Exhibit List]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Psychiatric Report]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 06, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 04, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • September 24, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 24, 2021: [Sentencing]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Psychiatric Report]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 05, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 04, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Treatment]
  • September 24, 2020: [Psychiatric Treatment]
  • September 15, 2020: [Psychiatric Report]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Order]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • May 11, 2020: [Response to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Psychiatric Exam]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 24, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • February 24, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 24, 2020: [Competency Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Psychiatric Report]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • March 25, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2019: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 17, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 28, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 28, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 28, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 14, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 06, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.