U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00222-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 19, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 19, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • October 19, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • October 19, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 08, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 02, 2020: [Subpoena Returned]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 29, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 29, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • September 29, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 29, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 26, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 28, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 23, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 17, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 18, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 16, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 06, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.