U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00218-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flowers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 22, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • April 16, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 18, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • March 18, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 11, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 05, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 05, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 05, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 05, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 06, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2019: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 22, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 22, 2019: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 22, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • October 22, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • October 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 11, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 06, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.