U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00220-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 17, 2019: [Jury Verdict (Un-Redacted)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Jury Verdict (Redacted)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 15, 2019: [Jury Trial]
  • May 13, 2019: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • May 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 07, 2019: [Application for Writ]
  • May 06, 2019: [Bill of Particulars]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 25, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 15, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 15, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2018: [Attachment]
  • November 06, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 06, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.