U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00226-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Collins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 03, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 27, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • June 21, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 10, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 21, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 21, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 08, 2019: [Continue]
  • February 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 09, 2019: [Response]
  • January 09, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 04, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 04, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 04, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 07, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • November 07, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.