U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00225-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Remark]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 22, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 10, 2022: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • March 10, 2022: [Judgment - 2255]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • September 22, 2020: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • November 13, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 12, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • November 08, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • October 10, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 10, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 09, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 04, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 04, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 06, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 03, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • May 21, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 21, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 21, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 16, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 15, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 07, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • November 07, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.