U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00223-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spells
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 24, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 24, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 24, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 21, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 20, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 11, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 07, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • November 07, 2018: [Restricted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.