U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00224-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 08, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 03, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
  • April 26, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 26, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 19, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 19, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 21, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 21, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 09, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 07, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • November 07, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.