U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 12, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 30, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 29, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 20, 2022: [Competency Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 17, 2022: [Psychiatric Report]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Medical Exam]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Medical Exam]
  • October 25, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 22, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 03, 2021: [Bond]
  • September 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 02, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 01, 2021: [Bond]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 02, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 24, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • May 21, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • May 20, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 25, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 21, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 19, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 19, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 18, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 14, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 07, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.