U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fields
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment - 2255]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 04, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 16, 2021: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • January 04, 2021: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 20, 2020: [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
  • July 20, 2020: [USCA Order]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • April 27, 2020: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 27, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 22, 2020: [Letter]
  • April 02, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 17, 2020: [Transcript Request]
  • March 05, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 05, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 04, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 21, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 19, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 19, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 19, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • February 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • February 18, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 15, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 15, 2020: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 20, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • May 07, 2019: [Response to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 26, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 26, 2019: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 06, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 06, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 21, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 20, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 19, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 09, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 08, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • November 08, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.