U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 18, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • March 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 18, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 18, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 18, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 17, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 21, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 20, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 08, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • November 08, 2018: [Restricted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.