U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Montalvo-Salvador
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 23, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 17, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 15, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 13, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 08, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • November 08, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.