U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hercules
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 05, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • June 05, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 05, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 05, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 05, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 05, 2020: [Unseal Document]
  • March 05, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 13, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 13, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 18, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 18, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 14, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 14, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • December 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • November 28, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 21, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 20, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 08, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • November 08, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.