U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Casey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 07, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 06, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 03, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 03, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • May 03, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 01, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 06, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 06, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 31, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 27, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 11, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • November 16, 2018: [CJA Appointment Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 15, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 14, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 08, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 08, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.