U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 03, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 14, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • June 11, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 11, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 02, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 11, 2021: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • January 05, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 16, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • December 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 15, 2020: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 11, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • December 07, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • December 04, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • December 03, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 03, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 03, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 03, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 03, 2020: [Competency Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Status Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 30, 2020: [Letter]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Sealed Document]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 13, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 02, 2020: [Reconsideration]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Psychiatric Report]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 06, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 14, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 13, 2019: [Unseal Case]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 19, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 17, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • August 06, 2019: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 27, 2019: [Discovery]
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 14, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 13, 2019: [Bond]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 13, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [Waiver of Counsel]
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • February 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 12, 2019: [Unseal Case]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.