U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00228-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • October 01, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 21, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • September 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 04, 2020: [Reconsideration]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 09, 2020: [Reply to Response]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 11, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order]
  • May 11, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • March 01, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 01, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 16, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 16, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 16, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2018: [Bond]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 15, 2018: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • November 15, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.