U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goodhart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 22, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 22, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • February 22, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 28, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 28, 2018: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 27, 2018: [Bond]
  • November 27, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 27, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 27, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 26, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 19, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • November 19, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.