U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McClelland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 19, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • November 16, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 09, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 16, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 16, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 25, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 11, 2019: [Unseal Document]
  • January 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Case Inquiry Report]
  • November 20, 2018: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.