U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00165-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'Brien
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 10, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • December 10, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 04, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 04, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 04, 2018: [Unseal Document]
  • December 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Case Inquiry Report]
  • November 20, 2018: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.