U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bailey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Remark]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Subpoena Returned]
  • March 18, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 14, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • March 14, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 06, 2019: [Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • February 27, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • February 27, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 27, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 27, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 26, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 26, 2019: [Bond]
  • February 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 25, 2019: [Unseal Document]
  • February 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.