U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00176-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Berry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Reconsideration]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Case Inquiry Report]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.