U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Putnam
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 27, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • February 27, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 06, 2019: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • February 06, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 06, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: [Bond]
  • February 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 04, 2019: [Unseal Document]
  • February 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons (12C)]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Case Inquiry Report]
  • January 02, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.