U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pettaway
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 09, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Remark]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 10, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 03, 2020: [Psychiatric Report]
  • December 03, 2020: [Competency Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Status Report]
  • November 16, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • January 14, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.