U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00250-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pearson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • September 21, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • April 22, 2020: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 22, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 03, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 02, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 01, 2020: [Release from Custody]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • March 18, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • March 02, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 02, 2020: [Sealed Transcript]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 07, 2020: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • January 07, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 20, 2019: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • December 11, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 10, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2019: [Exhibit List]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2019: [Jury Verdict (Un-Redacted)]
  • April 25, 2019: [Jury Verdict (Redacted)]
  • April 25, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 24, 2019: [Judgment NOV]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Jury Trial]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 18, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 18, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2019: [In Limine]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Status Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order]
  • January 31, 2019: [Docket Call]
  • January 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 28, 2019: [Waiver]
  • January 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 23, 2019: [Bond]
  • January 23, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 23, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 22, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.