U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bond
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 25, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 08, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 08, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 26, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 30, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 30, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 30, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2019: [Remark]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.