U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 17, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 12, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 12, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 25, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 22, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 13, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 12, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 31, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 30, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • January 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 28, 2019: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • January 28, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • January 28, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.