U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Youngblood
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 24, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 09, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 07, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 31, 2019: [Bond]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 31, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 30, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 30, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • January 29, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.