U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00245-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cassity
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 15, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 13, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 05, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 05, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 05, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • February 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.