U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Storey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 03, 2021: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Subpoena Returned]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 01, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 28, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 07, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 07, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 05, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • February 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.