U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chaney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 05, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 05, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 05, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 03, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 31, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 08, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 04, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 04, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 13, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.