U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomley et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 15, 2020: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 05, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 05, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 14, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 11, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 10, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 08, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 24, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 24, 2020: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 24, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 23, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 16, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 15, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [Protective Order]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [Protective Order]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Travel]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Protective Order]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Protective Order]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • January 14, 2020: [Travel]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 06, 2020: [Protective Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • October 23, 2019: [Seal or Restrict]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Travel]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 28, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 27, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Attachment]
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 16, 2019: [Travel]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 08, 2019: [Travel]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Attachment]
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 12, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 19, 2019: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 07, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 26, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 26, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 22, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 21, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 21, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 20, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 20, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 20, 2019: [Waiver]
  • February 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2019: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • February 19, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.