U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 28, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • November 10, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 26, 2021: [Leave to Appeal]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 16, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 13, 2021: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • August 13, 2021: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 06, 2021: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • August 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 20, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 20, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 23, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 22, 2021: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • June 04, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 02, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 11, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • May 07, 2021: [Rebuttal]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 14, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 01, 2021: [Response to Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 18, 2021: [Compel]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • March 05, 2021: [Clarify]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 04, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 24, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 24, 2019: [Sentencing]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 02, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 02, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 01, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 26, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • March 25, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 20, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 25, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 22, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [Waiver]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 22, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.