U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Riley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 23, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • June 23, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 08, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • June 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 18, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 15, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Dismiss]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 07, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 17, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • June 21, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 21, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 21, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 23, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 22, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 21, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 16, 2019: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • May 16, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • May 16, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 10, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2019: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 03, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • April 03, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.