U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jimenez-Alvarenga
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 02, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Restricted Motion]
  • November 05, 2019: [Restricted Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 13, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2019: [Letter]
  • September 03, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 26, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 06, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 10, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 04, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2019: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 04, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • April 04, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.