U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 24, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 24, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 24, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • July 18, 2019: [Expedite]
  • July 01, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 26, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 25, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 24, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2019: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 18, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • April 18, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.