U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00063-3
  • Case Name: USA v. McPherson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Remark]
  • January 13, 2023: [Remark]
  • January 13, 2023: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 05, 2022: [Restricted Document]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • February 08, 2022: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • February 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • September 02, 2021: [Reply to Response]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 25, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 14, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • February 17, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • February 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 13, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • January 06, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • December 29, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • December 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • December 07, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 07, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 03, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 09, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • November 05, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • November 02, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order]
  • October 21, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • September 30, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 27, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 24, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 17, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 27, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • May 22, 2020: [Transcript Request]
  • May 21, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • March 05, 2020: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 04, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 04, 2020: [Mail Returned]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • February 04, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 03, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 02, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 31, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 31, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 31, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 28, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 27, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 27, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 27, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 24, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 24, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 15, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 14, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 14, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 14, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 10, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 06, 2020: [Subpoena Returned]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Remark]
  • December 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • December 20, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 05, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • December 05, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 03, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 03, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
  • December 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 02, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 30, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 27, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 18, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 18, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 18, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 18, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 18, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 17, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 17, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 16, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 12, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • September 12, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 10, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 09, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 06, 2019: [Suppress]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • August 26, 2019: [Subpoena Returned]
  • August 26, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • August 13, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 22, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • July 22, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • July 22, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2019: [Remark]
  • July 19, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • July 19, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 16, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 06, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 03, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 02, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • April 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 24, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • April 24, 2019: [Bond]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 24, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 24, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • April 23, 2019: [Release from Custody]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.