U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rankin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 08, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 17, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Exhibit List]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 28, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 23, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 05, 2021: [Remark]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Status Report]
  • November 17, 2020: [Status Report]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
April, 2019
  • April 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 26, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • April 25, 2019: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 25, 2019: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.