U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 19, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 18, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • July 16, 2019: [Expedite]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 09, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 09, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.