U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valdez-Santana
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 25, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 22, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 20, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 01, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • June 10, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 10, 2019: [Seal or Restrict]
  • June 10, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 09, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 09, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.