U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Duniesky
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 07, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 04, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 21, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 21, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 21, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 21, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 19, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 02, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 30, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • July 30, 2019: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • July 30, 2019: [Remark]
  • July 30, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • July 30, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • July 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 11, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.