U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cristobal-Joaquin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 15, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 16, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 20, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • June 19, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 19, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2019: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • June 13, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • June 13, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.