U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Betts
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • November 12, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 08, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • September 08, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
August, 2020
  • August 29, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order]
  • August 27, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2020: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 23, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 08, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • July 29, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 26, 2019: [Bond]
  • June 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 24, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • June 21, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.